Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0882939 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2003 | B1 | EP0882939 | 19.01.2000 | A4 | EP0882939 | 09.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP33331996 | 13.12.1996 | JP9704554 | 10.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9826239 | Global Dossier | 18.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP33331996 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3769338B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2006 | B2 | JPH10176893 | 30.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33331996 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1128331C | 19.11.2003 | C | CN1211312 | 17.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33331996 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100472526B | 07.07.2005 | B1 | KR19990082278 | 25.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33331996 | 13.12.1996 |