EP0949265 - RADIOACTIVE TRANSITION METAL NITRIDE HETERO-COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO., LTD. 9-8 Rokutanji-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0918 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Nihon Medi-Physics Co., Ltd. 9-8 Rokutanji-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0918 / JP | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Nihon Medi-Physics Co., Ltd. 9-8, Rokutanji-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUATTI, Adriano Via Galvana, 34 I-44040 Chiesuol del Fosso / IT | 02 /
BOLZATI, Cristina Via Martiri, 1 I-44037 Iolanda di Savoia / IT | 03 /
UCCELLI, Licia Via Modena, 81 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 04 /
REFOSCO, Fiorenzo Via Libia, 24A I-36078 Valdagno / IT | 05 /
TISATO, Francesco Via Barozzi, 9 I-35128 Padova / IT | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97947953.2 | 16.12.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997JP04626 | Priority number, date | JP19960338553 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33855396 | [1999/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827100 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949265 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949265 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/50, C07F9/70, C07F9/72, C07F13/00, A61K51/04 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
C07F13/005 (EP,US);
C07F9/50 (KR);
A61K51/0476 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US);
C07F9/5004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | C07F9/50, C07F9/70, C07F9/72, C07F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/41] | Title | German: | NITRID-HETEROKOMPLEXE VON RADIOAKTIVEN ÜBERGANGSMETALLEN | [1999/41] | English: | RADIOACTIVE TRANSITION METAL NITRIDE HETERO-COMPLEX | [1999/41] | French: | HETEROCOMPLEXE A NITRURE DE METAL DE TRANSITION RADIOACTIF | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1999 | Translation filed | 09.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.08.2003 | LU | 16.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/02] | GR | 07.08.2003 | |
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 07.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PASQUALINI R. ET AL., "Synthesis and characterization of the new neutral myocardial imaging agent (99mTcN(noet)2) (noet=N-Ethyl-N-ethoxydithiocarbamato)", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS., CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH., GB, (19920915), no. 18, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 1354 - 1355, XP002156372 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39920001354 | [A] - MARCHI A. ET AL., "Nitrido-technetium and -rhenium complexes with chelating phosphi- nes : synthesis, reactivity and crystal structures", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS., CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH., GB, (19930407), no. 8, ISSN 0300-9246, pages 1281 - 1286, XP002156373 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/dt9930001281 | [T] - BARALDI P G ET AL, "Synthesis of hybrid distamycin-cysteine labeled with Tc: a model for a novel class of cancer imaging agents", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, (200006), vol. 10, no. 12, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1397 - 1400, XP004207014 [T] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00250-X | International search | [X]JPH05508842 ; | [X]JPH07500816 ; | [X]JPH07110869B |