18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
03.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
28.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
21.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
23.04.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
19.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
12.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
14.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
02.05.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] |
21.03.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.10.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |
11.10.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
09.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.06.2002 |
First examination report |
|
31.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.12.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
21.07.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] |
14.07.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
19.05.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
19.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
20.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|