Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1016033 | 18.06.2003 | B1 | EP1016033 | 05.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9718705 | 20.11.1997 | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE243342T | 15.07.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9718705 | 20.11.1997 | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5424498 | 05.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9718705 | 20.11.1997 | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69722971T | 04.12.2003 | T2 | DE69722971D1 | 24.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9718705 | 20.11.1997 | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA001689 | 25.06.2001 | B1 | EA200000321 | 30.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9718705 | 20.11.1997 | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1122243C | 24.09.2003 | C | CN1276077 | 06.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6047251 | 04.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9914708 | 25.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92978897 | 15.09.1997 |