blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970195

EP0970195 - FATTY-ACID AMIDE HYDROLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2007/42]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
The Scripps Research Institute
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GILULA, Norton, B.
11 East Roseland
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
02 / CRAVATT, Benjamin, F.
3435 Lebon Drive, No. 1024
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
03 / LERNER, Richard, A.
7750 E. Roseland Drive
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97948210.604.11.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997US20385
Priority number, dateUS1996074316804.11.1996         Original published format: US 743168
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9820119
Date:14.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970195
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970195
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/78, C12N9/80, C12N9/14, C12P7/64, A61K38/46
[2000/02]
CPC:
C07C45/45 (EP,US); A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); C07C233/09 (EP,US); C07C327/22 (EP,US);
C07C49/227 (EP,US); C07C57/03 (EP,US); C07F9/5407 (EP,US);
C12N9/80 (EP,US); C12N9/99 (EP,US); C12P7/6418 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C07C45/45, C07C49/227 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesAL25.05.1999
LT25.05.1999
LV25.05.1999
MK25.05.1999
RO25.05.1999
SI25.05.1999
TitleGerman:FETTSÄUREAMIDE HYDROLASE[2000/02]
English:FATTY-ACID AMIDE HYDROLASE[2000/02]
French:HYDROLASE AYANT POUR SUBSTRAT UN AMIDE D'ACIDE GRAS[2007/22]
Former [2000/02]AMIDE D'ACIDE GRAS HYDROLASE
Entry into regional phase25.05.1999National basic fee paid 
25.05.1999Search fee paid 
25.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.05.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
05.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2007Fee for grant paid
14.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200004   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2001
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
LU04.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
[2010/05]
Former [2009/13]AT17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE17.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/24]NL17.10.2007
SE17.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/23]NL17.10.2007
SE17.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]  - CRAVATT ET AL., "Molecular characterization of an enzyme that degrades neuromodulatory fatty-acid amides", NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, no. 6604, pages 83 - 87, XP001010267 [X] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/384083a0
 [PX]  - THOMAS ET AL., "Fatty acid amide hydrolase, the degradative enzyme for anandamide and oleamide, has selective distribution in neurons within the rat central nervous system", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 50, pages 1047 - 1052, XP001012430 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4547(19971215)50:6<1047::AID-JNR16>3.0.CO;2-1
 [A]  - UEDA ET AL., "Partial purification and charcterization of the porcine brain enzyme hydrolyzing and sythesizing anandamide", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19951006), vol. 270, no. 40, pages 23823 - 23827, XP002171594

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.40.23823
 [PX]  - GIANG ET AL., "Molecular characterization of human and mouse fatty acid amide hydrolases", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (199703), vol. 94, pages 2238 - 2242, XP002171595 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.6.2238
International search[Y]US4165258  (PYE E KENDALL, et al);
 [Y]  - MAYAUX J.-F., ET AL., "PURIFICATION, CLONING, AND PRIMARY STRUCTURE OF AN ENANTIOMER-SELECTIVE AMIDASE FROM BREVIBACTERIUM SP. STRAIN R312: STRUCTURAL EVIDENCE FOR GENETIC COUPLING WITH NITRILE HYDRATASE.", Journal of Bacteriology, American Society for Microbiology, US, US, (19901201), vol. 172., no. 12., ISSN 0021-9193, pages 6764 - 6773., XP000283074
 [Y]  - CRAVATT, B.F. ET AL., "Chemical Characterization of a Family of Brain Lipids that Induce Sleep", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19950609), vol. 268., doi:10.1126/science.7770779, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1506 - 1509., XP002102114

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7770779
 [Y]  - DEUTSCH D. G., CHIN S. A., "ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS AND DEGRADATION OF ANANDAMIDE, A CANNABINOID RECEPTOR AGONIST.", Biochemical Pharmacology, Elsevier, US, US, (19930901), vol. 46., no. 05., doi:10.1016/0006-2952(93)90486-G, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 791 - 796., XP000943707

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(93)90486-G
 [Y]  - KOUTEK B., ET AL., "INHIBITORS OF ARACHIDONOYL ETHANOLAMIDE HYDROLYSIS*.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19940916), vol. 269., no. 37., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22937 - 22940., XP002040931
 [Y]  - SCOPES R.K., PROTEIN PURIFICATION, NEW YORK, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1987), XP001052767 [Y] * page 100 - page 114 *
 [Y]  - ABELES R. H., "ENZYME INHIBITORS: GROUND-STATE/TRANSITION-STATE ANALOGS.", DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH., NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19870101), vol. 10., doi:10.1002/ddr.430100405, ISSN 0272-4391, pages 221 - 234., XP000943736

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ddr.430100405
 [Y]  - MAURELLI S, ET AL., "TWO NOVEL CLASSES OF NEUROACTIVE FATTY ACID AMIDES ARE SUBSTRATES FOR MOUSE NEUROBLASTOMA 'ANANDAMIDE AMIDOHYDROLASE'", FEBS LETTERS., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19950101), vol. 377, doi:10.1016/0014-5793(95)01311-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 82 - 86, XP001000679

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(95)01311-3
 [Y]  - OHKAWA T., "Microbial Degradation of Fatty Acid Diethanolamide", JOURNAL OF ANTIBACTERIAL AND ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS, (1990), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 371 - 374, XP002949350
 [YP]  - PATTERSON, JEAN E. ET AL., "Inhibition of oleamide hydrolase catalysed hydrolysis of the endogenous sleep-inducing lipid cis-9-octadecenamide", Journal of the American Chemical Society, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19960626), vol. 118, no. 25, doi:10.1021/ja954064z, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5938 - 5945, XP002129254

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja954064z
 [Y]  - "FATTY ACID AMIDES: SCOOTING MODE-BASED DISCOVERY OF TIGHT-BINDING COMPETITIVE INHIBITORS OF SECRETED PHOSPHOLIPASES A2", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19920101), vol. 35, doi:10.1021/jm00097a018, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3584 - 3586, XP002949349

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00097a018
 [YP]  - ROSELL G, HERRERO S, GUERRERO A, "NEW TRIFLUOROMETHYL KETONES AS POTENT INHIBITORS OF ESTERASES: 19F NMR SPECTROSCOPY OF TRANSITION STATE ANALOG COMPLEXES AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, US, (19960101), vol. 226, doi:10.1006/bbrc.1996.1347, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 287 - 292, XP002949392

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.1347
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.