EP0954263 - NEAR HYPERTHERMIC HEATER WOUND COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUGUSTINE MEDICAL, INC. Suite 100, 10393 West 70th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGUSTINE, Scott, D. 9017 Cavell Circle Bloomington, MN 55438 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [1999/45] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97948340.1 | 12.11.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997US21013 | Priority number, date | US19970786714 | 21.01.1997 Original published format: US 786714 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831311 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954263 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954263 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02, A61F7/03 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
A61F7/007 (EP,US);
A61F13/023 (EP,US);
A61F7/02 (EP,US);
A61F7/03 (EP,US);
A61M1/85 (EP,US);
A61M3/0283 (EP,US);
A61M35/30 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0001 (EP,US);
A61F2007/006 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0086 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0095 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0226 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0255 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0295 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0017 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00174 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00187 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00195 (EP,US);
A61F2013/002 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00212 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0057 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00825 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00834 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00846 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00851 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00868 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00872 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00906 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00919 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00944 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00953 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0275 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | BEHEIZTE WUNDABDECKUNG MIT LEICHT HYPERTHERMISCHER EIGENSCHAFT | [1999/45] | English: | NEAR HYPERTHERMIC HEATER WOUND COVERING | [1999/45] | French: | PANSEMENT CHAUFFANT QUASI-HYPERTHERMIQUE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 07.06.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2000 | ES | 20.12.2000 | FI | 20.12.2000 | NL | 20.12.2000 | DK | 20.03.2001 | PT | 20.03.2001 | GR | 23.03.2001 | [2005/01] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
ES | 20.12.2000 | ||
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
NL | 20.12.2000 | ||
DK | 20.03.2001 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
ES | 20.12.2000 | ||
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
NL | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
ES | 20.12.2000 | ||
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 20.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5053024 (DVORETZKY ISRAEL [US]) [A] 1,17,30,38 * column 3, line 50 - line 52 *; | [XA]WO9319706 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,17,18,30,31,33-38 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 5 * * page 17, paragraph 4 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 5-16,20-27,29; | [X]EP0638300 (KIRIBAI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,17,18,30,31,38 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9610379 (SARINGER RES INC [CA]) [A] 1,2,17,30,38* claims 5-8 * | by applicant | FR1527887 |