EP0942678 - A CLEANING IMPLEMENT HAVING CONTROLLED FLUID ABSORBENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLD, Steven, Allen 2782 Westonridge Drive Cincinnati, OH 45239 / US | 02 /
MASTERS, Ronald, A. 2300 Catalpa Drive Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 03 /
PING, Vernon, Sanford 10044 Daly Road Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 97948516.6 | 26.11.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US21567 | Priority number, date | US19960756507 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: US 756507 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823199 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942678 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942678 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0942678 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/16 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
A47L13/16 (EP,US);
A47L13/20 (EP,US);
A47L13/22 (EP,US);
C11D17/049 (EP,US);
C11D2111/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/05] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSGERÄT MIT KONTROLLIERTER FLÜSSIGKEITSAUFSAUGE | [1999/38] | English: | A CLEANING IMPLEMENT HAVING CONTROLLED FLUID ABSORBENCY | [1999/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE, AYANT UNE CAPACITE CONTROLEE D'ABSORPTION DE FLUIDE | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 29.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.01.2003
08.04.2004
WITHDRAWN HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.01.2003
08.04.2004
WITHDRAWN Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.01.2003
WITHDRAWN Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 14.02.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.10.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.06.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01178223 ; | [A]FR2133632 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [A]US3761991 (MOSS T) [A] 1,3,9 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]US5090832 (RIVERA LIGIA A [US], et al) [AD] 1-3,13 * column W *; | [A]EP0696432 (ELYSEES BALZAC FINANCIERE [FR]) [A] 1,3,13 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 12; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891016), vol. 13, no. 457, Database accession no. (C - 644), & JP01178223 A 19890714 (HIROYUKI KANAI) [A] * abstract * | Examination | EP0130764 | US4902544 | US5419015 |