EP0971642 - IMPLANT DEPLOYMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | [2008/49] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEOPOLD, Eric, W. 999 Evelyn Terrace West 2 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
TRAUTMAN, Joseph, C. 574 Laurie Jo Lane Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | 03 /
THORNTON, Troy 130A South Park San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
CHAN, Randy, S. 1623 Parkview Green Circle San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 05 /
PAI, Suresh, S. 100 East Middlefield Road 6A Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 06 /
BRETON, Thomas, G. 1021 Fife Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2000/03] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 97948535.6 | 09.12.1997 | [2000/03] | WO1997US21641 | Priority number, date | US19960772373 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: US 772373 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827894 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971642 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971642 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/88 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US);
A61F2/9525 (EP,US);
A61F2/954 (EP,US);
A61F2/97 (EP,US);
A61F2/848 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/067 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9511 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFALTUNG EINES IMPLANTATS | [2000/03] | English: | IMPLANT DEPLOYMENT APPARATUS | [2000/03] | French: | APPAREIL DE DEPLOIEMENT D'IMPLANT | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 06.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2007 | 20.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08019843.5 / EP2065014 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Request for further processing for: | 23.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2005 | Decision despatched | 23.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IT | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | IE | 09.12.2008 | LU | 09.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9317636 (PEROUSE IMPLANT LAB [FR]) [X] 1-4,9-21,23-26,30,34-41,44,45* the whole document *; | [DY]US5405378 (STRECKER ERNST P [DE]) [DY] 3,4,7,20,21,23,24,30 * column A; figure - *; | [XY]EP0696447 (CARDIOVASCULAR CONCEPTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9-19,32-41,44-47 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,7,20,21,23,24,30 | Examination | EP0701800 | EP0716836 | EP0943302 |