Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0932794 | Global Dossier | 04.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644466 | 25.10.1996 | EP9705823 | 22.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29621297U | 07.05.1997 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644466 | 25.10.1996 | DE29621297 | 25.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29718641U | 22.01.1998 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644466 | 25.10.1996 | DE29718641 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9819098 | Global Dossier | 07.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644466 | 25.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19644466 | 30.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644466 | 25.10.1996 |