EP0955455 - POWER GENERATION METHOD AND POWER GENERATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIJIMA, Masaki, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97949110.7 | 17.12.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997JP04646 | Priority number, date | JP19960357129 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35712996 | JP19970047264 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4726497 | JP19970047265 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4726597 | JP19970050976 | 19.02.1997 Original published format: JP 5097697 | JP19970058375 | 26.02.1997 Original published format: JP 5837597 | JP19970150202 | 23.05.1997 Original published format: JP 15020297 | JP19970260910 | 09.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26091097 | [1999/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9829653 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955455 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955455 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/28, F02C6/00, F02C7/22, F01K23/06 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
F02C3/28 (EP,US);
F01K23/06 (KR);
F01K23/064 (EP,US);
F01K23/067 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/45] | F02C3/28, F02C6/00, F02C7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, NL [1999/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIEGEWINNUNG | [1999/45] | English: | POWER GENERATION METHOD AND POWER GENERATING APPARATUS | [1999/45] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ELECTRICITE ET INSTALLATIONS ASSOCIEES | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1999 | Translation filed | 25.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2018/28] | ES | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5469699 (DAMAN ERNEST L [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,12,13,15,16 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 67; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH07109904 ; | [X]JPH07208111 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07109904 A 19950425 (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO INC:THE) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12,13,15,16 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07208111 A 19950808 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4,12,13,15 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH06207180 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPS60243305 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [Y]JPS581720B ; | [XE]JPH1018859 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [A]EP0061262 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]); | [P]JPH09189206 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | - JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR GAS TURBINES AND POWER, (199610), vol. 118, page 737 |