EP1063508 - CONTAINER FOR URINE TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atleta Incorporation 706 No.8 Matsuya Bldg. 2-1-35 Nouninbashi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Atleta Incorporation 706 No. 8 Matsuya Bldg., 2-1-35 Nouninbashi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-0011 / JP | ||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states ITOCHU CORPORATION 1-3, Kyutaro-machi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-77 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Ichiro 1-4, Kasuga 2-chome Suita-shi, Osaka 565 / JP | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97949199.0 | 19.12.1997 | [2000/52] | WO1997JP04744 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932871 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063508 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/10, G01N33/493, A61B5/20 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
A61B10/007 (EP,KR);
B01L3/502 (EP,KR);
B01L3/5082 (EP,KR);
G01N33/493 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | BEHALTER ZUM URIN-TEST | [2000/52] | English: | CONTAINER FOR URINE TEST | [2000/52] | French: | RECIPIENT POUR ANALYSE D'URINE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2000 | Translation filed | 13.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0894615 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al) |