EP0949260 - ACID-ADDITION SALTS OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE PIPERIDINE COMPOUND AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | ||
For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITA, Jun-ichiro Ube Res. Laboratory Ube Ind., Ltd., 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi,Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Hiroshi Ube Res. Lab. Ube Ind. Ltd., 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMURA, Shinji Ube Res. Laboratory Ube Ind. Ltd1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIOKA, Ryuzo 80-2-306, Todaiji 3-chome Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 618 / JP | 05 /
OZAKI, Yasuhiko 18-18, Ishizuhigashimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | 06 /
YAMADA, Shin-ichi 4-18, Nakasu 1-chome Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665 / JP | [2000/01] |
Former [1999/41] | 01 /
KITA, Jun-ichiro Ube Res. Laboratory Ube Ind., Ltd., 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi,Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIWARA, Hiroshi Ube Res. Lab. Ube Ind. Ltd., 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAMURA, Shinji Ube Res. Laboratory Ube Ind. Ltd1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755 / JP | |||
04 /
YOSHIOKA, Ryuzo 80-2-306, Todaiji 3-chome Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 618 / JP | |||
05 /
OZAKI, Yauhiko 18-18, Ishizuhigashimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMADA, Shin-ichi 4-18, Nakasu 1-chome Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97949235.2 | 25.12.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997JP04826 | Priority number, date | JP19960347851 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34785196 | JP19960347853 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34785396 | JP19960347895 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34789596 | [1999/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9829409 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949260 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949260 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, // (A61K31/445, C07M7:00) | [1999/41] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/41] | Title | German: | SÄUREADDITIONSSALZE EINER OPTISCH AKTIVEN PIPERIDINVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1999/41] | English: | ACID-ADDITION SALTS OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE PIPERIDINE COMPOUND AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1999/41] | French: | SELS D'ADDITION ACIDES DE COMPOSE DE PIPERIDINE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1999 | Translation filed | 05.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS6413090 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH01242574 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH04182467 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH05345759 (KAKEN PHARMA CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06135958 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO); | [Y]JPH06239742 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO); | [Y]JPH06336480 (UBE INDUSTRIES) |