EP1023795 - CONTROL FOR A GLOBAL TRANSPORT DATA STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA, INC. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. One Technology Parkway South Norcross, Georgia 30092 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THATCHER, William, B. 1851 Anjaco Road, N.W. Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | 02 /
WASILEWSKI, Anthony, J. 10680 Wren Ridge Road Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 97949357.4 | 28.10.1997 | [2000/31] | WO1997US19890 | Priority number, date | US19960745483 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: US 745483 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821852 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023795 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023795 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/26606 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/31] | Title | German: | KONTROLLE FÜR EINEN GLOBALEN DATENTRANSPORTSTROM | [2000/31] | English: | CONTROL FOR A GLOBAL TRANSPORT DATA STREAM | [2000/31] | French: | COMMANDE POUR DES TRAINS DE DONNEES DE TRANSPORT GLOBAL | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 02.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/49] | NL | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4744080 (BRENNAND PETER R [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column W *; | [Y]EP0461029 (MATRA COMMUNICATION [FR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4369434 (MUELLER KURT H [CH]); | [A]US4744080 (BRENNAND PETER R [GB], et al); | [A]US5029207 (GAMMIE KEITH B [CA]); | [A]US5237610 (GAMMIE KEITH [CA], et al); | [A]US5500898 (NANKAKU NAGAHIKO [JP]) | Examination | AU636039 |