EP0949928 - ANDROGENIC AND BISPHOSPHONIC AGENTS COADMINISTERED TO TREAT DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Azriel 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
RODAN, Gideon 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
HARADA, Shun-Ichi 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1999/42] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97949529.8 | 21.11.1997 | [1999/42] | WO1997US21306 | Priority number, date | US19960031734P | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 31734 P | US19960032341P | 04.12.1996 Original published format: US 32341 P | GB19970000697 | 15.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9700697 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823274 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949928 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, A61K31/66, // (A61K31/66, 31:56) | [2000/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/66 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/66, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/66, A61K31/565 (EP) |
Former IPC [1999/42] | A61K31/56, A61K31/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/42] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMEN VERABREICHTE ANDROGENE UND DIPHOSPHONVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [1999/42] | English: | ANDROGENIC AND BISPHOSPHONIC AGENTS COADMINISTERED TO TREAT DISEASES | [1999/42] | French: | AGENTS ANDROGENE ET BISPHOSPHONIQUE COADMINISTRES POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES | [1999/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0555845 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1,3-9 * page 3, lines 29-32 * * claims 2,3 * * page 2, lines 4-33 * [Y] 1-9; | [Y]WO9324128 (MATTERN ET PARTNER PHARMAZEUTI [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9414455 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9214474 (NORWICH EATON PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [Y] - WANG, C. (1) ET AL, "Sublingual testosterone replacement improves muscle mass and strength, decreases bone resorption, and increases bone formation markers in hypogonadal men: A clinical research center study.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY & METABOLISM, (1996) VOL. 81, NO. 10, PP. 3654-3662., XP000916279 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.81.10.3654 | [Y] - GLUECK, CHARLES J. (1) ET AL, "Idiopathic osteonecrosis, hypofibrinolysis, high plasminogen activator inhibitor, high lipoprotein(a), and therapy with stanozolol.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY, (1995) VOL. 48, NO. 4, PP. 213-220., XP000916283 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ajh.2830480402 | [Y] - REID, IAN R. (1) ET AL, "Glucocorticoid osteoporosis.", JOURNAL OF ASTHMA, (1994) VOL. 31, NO. 1, PP. 7-18., XP000916273 [Y] 1-9 * page 12, column R, lines 11-17 * * page 12, column R, line 44 - page 13, column L, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/02770909409056764 | [Y] - CHESTNUT, CHARLES H., III (1) ET AL, "Alendronate treatment of the postmenopausal osteoporotic woman: Effect of multiple dosages on bone mass and bone remodeling.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1995) VOL. 99, NO. 2, PP. 144-152., XP000916282 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9343(99)80134-X | International search | [Y]US5284841 (CHU LIN [US], et al); | [Y]US5547685 (CULLINAN GEORGE J [US]) |