29.05.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
13.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
05.05.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
09.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2005 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2005 |
First examination report |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] |
16.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.10.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
17.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.01.2000 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
23.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
06.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
04.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|