EP0943179 - FORCE FEEDBACK INTERFACE HAVING ISOTONIC AND ISOMETRIC FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 801 Fox Lane San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 801 Fox Lane San Jose, CA 95131 / US | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 2158 Paragon Drive San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Louis, B. 849 Palamino Drive Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/38] | Fiener, Josef Postfach 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97949594.2 | 25.11.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US21559 | Priority number, date | US19960756745 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: US 756745 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9826342 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943179 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943179 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/94, H03M11/00, G09G5/08, G06F1/00 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G05G9/047 (EP,US);
G06F3/0354 (EP,US);
G06F3/03543 (EP,US);
G06F3/0362 (EP,US);
G06F3/0395 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/38] | Title | German: | KRAFTRÜCKKOPPLUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE MIT ISOTONISCHER UND ISOMETRISCHER FUNKTIONALITÄT | [1999/38] | English: | FORCE FEEDBACK INTERFACE HAVING ISOTONIC AND ISOMETRIC FUNCTIONALITY | [1999/38] | French: | INTERFACE DE RETOUR DE FORCE A FONCTIONNALITES ISOTONIQUE ET ISOMETRIQUE | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.06.2006 | FR | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | DE | 08.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/08] | CH | 07.06.2006 | |
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DE | 08.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | CH | 07.06.2006 | |
LI | 07.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0489469 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,18,40,47,52,60,66,70 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 22 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 * * column 6, line 24 - column 10, line 32; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0663648 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,18,40,47,52,60,66,70 * abstract ** column 18, line 7 - column 19, line 2; figures 10,11 * | International search | [A]US5280276 (KWOK WONG W [HK]); | [A]US5355148 (ANDERSON WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US5374942 (GILLIGAN FEDERICO G [AR], et al); | [A]US5398044 (HILL TAPIO [FI]); | [A]US5438529 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al); | [A]US5457479 (CHENG VINCENT [TW]); | [A]US5530455 (GILLICK WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [A]US5576727 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) |