EP0941537 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE INFORMATION STORED ON A MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10333 North Meridian Street Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEHMEYER, Keith, Reynolds 6411 Columbia Circle Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Zhang, Jianguo TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Zhang, Jianguo THOMSON multimedia 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1999/37] | Zhang, Jianguo THOMSON multimedia, Licensing & IP, 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 97949652.8 | 25.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997US21766 | Priority number, date | US19960760529 | 02.12.1996 Original published format: US 760529 | US19960759319 | 02.12.1996 Original published format: US 759319 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825269 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941537 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941537 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/00, G11B27/11, G11B27/34, H04N7/173 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
H04N21/4135 (EP);
G11B27/00 (KR);
G11B27/002 (EP);
G11B27/032 (EP);
G11B27/11 (EP);
G11B27/34 (EP);
G11B27/36 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/4722 (EP);
H04N21/8113 (EP);
H04N21/812 (EP);
H04N21/8352 (EP);
H04N5/775 (EP);
G11B2220/213 (EP);
G11B2220/2545 (EP);
G11B2220/2562 (EP);
G11B2220/2587 (EP);
G11B2220/90 (EP);
G11B2220/913 (EP);
G11B27/105 (EP);
G11B27/107 (EP);
G11B27/28 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/37] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND METHODE ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON AUF EINEM MEDIUM GESPEICHERTER INFORMATION | [1999/37] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE INFORMATION STORED ON A MEDIUM | [1999/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR IDENTIFIER LES INFORMATIONS STOCKEES SUR UN SUPPORT | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 31.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01117205.3 / EP1152421 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9705616 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4872151 (SMITH MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1,5-8,10 * see abstract * * column 1, line 24 - line 38 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 36 * * column 8, line 38 - column 9, line 65 * * figure 7 *; | [XA]WO9207360 (MORO MARIO [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,9; | [A]US5262940 (SUSSMAN LESTER [US]) [A] 1,5,7-10 * column W *; | [A]JPH03219486 ; | [A]JPH03272074 ; | [A]JPH0736757 ; | [A]EP0425168 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0485740 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4870515 (STOKES RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-5,10 * column 3, line 1 - line 56 * * column 6, line 10 - line 14 * * column 8, line 8 - line 37 * * column 10, line 17 - line 26 * * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 22 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911220), vol. 015, no. 507, Database accession no. (P - 1291), & JP03219486 A 19910926 (NEC HOME ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1,5,7,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920304), vol. 016, no. 089, Database accession no. (P - 1320), & JP03272074 A 19911203 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,5,7,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 095, no. 005, & JP07036757 A 19950207 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,5,7-10 * abstract * |