blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969829

EP0969829 - SYNTHETIC TECHNIQUES AND INTERMEDIATES FOR POLYHYDROXY, DIENYLLACTONES AND MIMICS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania
3700 Market Street, Suite 300
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
3700 Market Street, Suite 300
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Amos, B., III
517 General Lafayette Road
Merion, PA 19066 / US
02 / QIU, Yuping
397 Conestoga Street
Windsor CT 06095 / US
03 / KAUFMAN, Michael
9201-A Jamison Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19115 / US
04 / ARIMOTO, Hirokaza
7-15 Miho-Daiichi, 1-20-7 Ordo
Shimizu, Shizuoka 424 / JP
05 / JONES, David, R.
5262 Wolfpen-Pleasant Hills Road
Milford, OH 45150 / US
06 / KOBAYASHI, Kaoru
2-12-1-20, Shimamoto-cho Aoba,Mishima-gun
Osaka 618 / JP
[2000/16]
Former [2000/02]01 / SMITH, Amos, B., III
517 General Lafayette Road
Merion, PA 19066 / US
02 / QIU, Yuping
Apartment 2F,4212 Chester Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
03 / KAUFMAN, Michael
9201-A Jamison Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19115 / US
04 / ARIMOTO, Hirokaza
Apartment 1,11 Wilde Avenue
Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US
05 / JONES, David, R.
5262 Wolfpen-Pleasant Hills Road
Milford, OH 45150 / US
06 / KOBAYASHI, Kaoru
2-12-1-20, Shimamoto-cho Aoba,Mishima-gun
Osaka 618 / JP
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Hallybone, Huw George, et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97949661.901.12.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997US21798
Priority number, dateUS1996075981703.12.1996         Original published format: US 759817
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9824429
Date:11.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969829
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/35, A61K31/38, A61K31/445, C07D211/44, C07D239/04, C07D265/06, C07D279/06, C07D309/04, C07D319/06, C07D327/06, C07D407/06, C07D309/10
[2002/10]
CPC:
C07D413/12 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); C07C239/06 (EP,US); C07D263/22 (EP,US);
C07D309/30 (EP,US); C07D319/06 (EP,US); C07F7/1892 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/02]A61K31/35, A61K31/38, A61K31/445, C07D211/44, C07D239/04, C07D265/06, C07D279/06, C07D309/04, C07D319/06, C07D327/06, C07D335/02, C07D339/08, B01J27/122
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SYNTHESETECHNIKEN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE FÜR POLYHYDROXY-DIENYLLAKTONE UND IHRE IMITATOREN[2000/02]
English:SYNTHETIC TECHNIQUES AND INTERMEDIATES FOR POLYHYDROXY, DIENYLLACTONES AND MIMICS THEREOF[2000/02]
French:TECHNIQUES DE SYNTHESE ET INTERMEDIAIRES POUR POLYHYDROXY, DIENYL LACTONES ET ANALOGUES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1999National basic fee paid 
01.07.1999Search fee paid 
01.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/10]
04.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4939168  (GUNASEKERA MALIKA [US], et al)
 [X]  - SMITH A B, ET AL., "TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF (-)-DISCODERMOLIDE", Journal of the American Chemical Society, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19950101), vol. 117, doi:10.1021/ja00153a030, ISSN 0002-7863, page 12011/12012, XP001018841

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00153a030
 [X]  - YANG G, MYLES D C, "THE SYNTHESIS OF THE C-9 TO C-21 SECTOR OF DISCODERMOLIDE: AN EFFICIENT ROUTE TO THE C13-13 Z-TRISUBSTITUTED ALKENE", Tetrahedron Letters, Pergamon, GB, GB, (19940101), vol. 35, no. 16, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)77155-3, ISSN 0040-4039, page 2503/2504, XP001109121

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)77155-3
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.