Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9850737 | Global Dossier | 12.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19718568 | 03.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8014098 | Global Dossier | 27.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19718568 | 03.05.1997 | EP9802291 | 17.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5313698 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19644284 | 24.10.1996 | EP9705881 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0964967 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2001 | B1 | EP0964967 | 22.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644284 | 24.10.1996 | EP9705881 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE203080T | 15.07.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644284 | 24.10.1996 | EP9705881 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19718568 | 12.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19718568 | 03.05.1997 | DE19644284 | 24.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59704042D1 | 16.08.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644284 | 24.10.1996 | EP9705881 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA983208 | 22.10.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19718568 | 03.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19644284 | 30.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644284 | 24.10.1996 |