EP0938594 - ALUMINIUM ALLOY FOR USE AS CORE MATERIAL IN BRAZING SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corus Aluminium Walzprodukte GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2000/38] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Hoogovens Aluminium Walzprodukte GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 D-56070 Koblenz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖNTGERATH, Jeroen, Andreas, Helmuth Ruyschstraat 7 NL-1091 BP Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
BÜRGER, Achim Jacques-Remy-Strasse 5 D-56203 Höhr-Grenzhausen / DE | 03 /
VIEREGGE, Klaus Am Kettenhaehnchen 10a D-56237 Nauort / DE | [1999/47] |
Former [1999/35] | 01 /
SÖNTGERATH, Jeroen, Andreas, Helmuth Ruyschstraat 7 NL-1091 BP Amsterdam / NL | ||
02 /
BÜRGER, Achim Jacques-Remy-Strasse 5 D-56203 Höhr-Grenzhausen / DE | |||
03 /
VIEREGGE, Klaus Fürst-Friedrich-Karl-Strasse 35 D-56564 Neuwied / DE | Representative(s) | Hansen, Willem Joseph Maria, et al Tata Steel Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Hansen, Willem Joseph Maria, et al Hoogovens Corporate Services BV, Industrial Property Department, P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 97950083.2 | 04.11.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997EP06070 | Priority number, date | NL19961004415 | 04.11.1996 Original published format: NL 1004415 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820178 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938594 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938594 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00, B32B15/01 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
F28F21/084 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/0238 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US);
B23K35/286 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS KERNWERKSTOFF EINES HARTLOTBLECHES | [1999/35] | English: | ALUMINIUM ALLOY FOR USE AS CORE MATERIAL IN BRAZING SHEET | [1999/35] | French: | ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM UTILISE COMME MATERIAU D'AME DANS UNE FEUILLE DE BRASURE | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 13.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Request for further processing for: | 29.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.2001 | Decision despatched | 19.07.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]JPH04297541 ; | [A]JPH0230394 ; | [A]DE3518407 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* claim 2 *; | JPS63186847 [ ] (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND, et al); | [DA]US4761267 (TAKENO SHINJI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-7 * column 5, line 30 - line 38; claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]EP0492796 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * example 1; table 1 *; | [DX]WO9422633 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al) [DX] 1-13 * page 12, line 5; figure 13; claim 32 *; | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930309), vol. 017, no. 113, Database accession no. (C - 1033), & JP04297541 A 19921021 (FURUKAWA ALUM CO LTD) [DX] 1-7,13 * abstract * | [DX] - TANABE, ZENICHI ET AL, "Aluminum alloy for heat-exchanger cores", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890206), vol. 110, no. 6, Database accession no. 43255, XP002032659 [DX] 1,2,5-7,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900409), vol. 014, no. 177, Database accession no. (M - 0960), & JP02030394 A 19900131 (FURUKAWA ALUM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |