EP0937075 - New Imidazo- and Oxazolopyridines as Phosphodiesterase Inhibitors. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/34] | NEW IMIDAZOPYRIDINES AND OXAZOLOPYRIDINES | ||
[2003/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTANA Pharma AG Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2003/51] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states ALTANA Pharma AG Byk-Gulden-Str. 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH Byk-Gulden-Str. 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMSCHLER, Hermann verstorben / DE | 02 /
MARTIN, Thomas St.-Martins-Weg 13 D-78462 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
FLOCKERZI, Dieter Ackerweg 26 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Beate Allensbacher Strasse 5 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | 05 /
THIBAUT, Ulrich Egger Wiese 14 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | 06 /
HATZELMANN, Armin Alter Wall 3 D-78467 Konstanz / DE | 07 /
BOSS, Hildegard Steig 6b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | 08 /
HÄFNER, Dietrich Beethovenstrasse 5 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | 09 /
KLEY, Hans-Peter Im Weinberg 3b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | 10 /
BEUME, Rolf Bohlstrasse 13 D-78465 Konstanz / DE | 11 /
BÄR, Thomas Berggässle 5 D-78479 Reichenau / DE | 12 /
ULRICH, Wolf-Rüdiger Alpenstr.2 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
AMSCHLER, Hermann Hohenhewenstrasse 19 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | ||
02 /
MARTIN, Thomas St.-Martins-Weg 13 D-78462 Konstanz / DE | |||
03 /
FLOCKERZI, Dieter Ackerweg 26 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
04 /
SCHMIDT, Beate Allensbacher Strasse 5 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
05 /
THIBAUT, Ulrich Egger Wiese 14 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
06 /
HATZELMANN, Armin Alter Wall 3 D-78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
07 /
BOSS, Hildegard Steig 6b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
08 /
HÄFNER, Dietrich Beethovenstrasse 5 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
09 /
KLEY, Hans-Peter Im Weinberg 3b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
10 /
BEUME, Rolf Bohlstrasse 13 D-78465 Konstanz / DE | |||
11 /
BÄR, Thomas Berggässle 5 D-78479 Reichenau / DE | |||
12 /
ULRICH, Wolf-Rüdiger Alpenstr.2 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
Former [1999/34] | 01 /
AMSCHLER, Hermann Hohenhewenstrasse 19 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | ||
02 /
MARTIN, Thomas Sonnenbühlstrasse 73 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
03 /
FLOCKERZI, Dieter Ackerweg 26 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
04 /
GUTTERER, Beate Allensbacher Strasse 6b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
05 /
THIBAUT, Ulrich Egger Wiese 14 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
06 /
HATZELMANN, Armin Alter Wall 3 D-78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
07 /
BOSS, Hildegard Flurweg 3a D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
08 /
HÄFNER, Dietrich Beethovenstrasse 5 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | |||
09 /
KLEY, Hans-Peter Im Weinberg 3b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
10 /
BEUME, Rolf Bohlstrasse 13 D-78465 Konstanz / DE | |||
11 /
BÄR, Thomas Blarerstrasse 16 D-78462 Konstanz / DE | |||
12 /
ULRICH, Wolf-Rüdiger Hebelstrasse 3 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | Application number, filing date | 97950116.0 | 05.11.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997EP06130 | Priority number, date | DE1996146460 | 11.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19646460 | EP19960118187 | 13.11.1996 Original published format: EP 96118187 | [1999/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821209 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937075 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937075 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D491/04, A61K31/435 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Extension states | AL | 11.06.1999 | LT | 11.06.1999 | LV | 11.06.1999 | MK | 11.06.1999 | RO | 11.06.1999 | SI | 11.06.1999 | Title | German: | Neue Imidazo- und Oxazolopyridine als Phosphodiesterase Inhibitoren. | [2003/24] | English: | New Imidazo- and Oxazolopyridines as Phosphodiesterase Inhibitors. | [2003/24] | French: | Nouvelles Imidazo- et Oxazolopyridines comme inhibiteurs de la Phosphodiesterase. | [2003/24] |
Former [1999/34] | NEUE IMIDAZO- UND OXAZOLOPYRIDINE | ||
Former [1999/34] | NEW IMIDAZOPYRIDINES AND OXAZOLOPYRIDINES | ||
Former [1999/34] | NOUVELLES IMIDAZOPYRIDINES ET OXAZOLOPYRIDINES | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Request for further processing for: | 04.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4038396 (SHEN TSUNG-YING, et al) [DA] 1-8* column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 10; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0079083 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [DA] 1-8 * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9412461 (PFIZER [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * examples 81-85,91-96; claim - *; | [A]WO9514680 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9535282 (CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * siehe das ganze Dokument *; | [A]WO9611917 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - * |