EP0951515 - MULTICOLOUR INK JET PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avecia Limited Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [1999/51] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGORY, Peter Hexagon House, P.O. Box 42, Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | 02 /
PROVOST, John, Reginald Hexagon House, P.O. Box 42, Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Mayall, John Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House, Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Mayall, John Intellectual Property Group Zeneca Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97950250.7 | 11.12.1997 | [1999/43] | WO1997GB03423 | Priority number, date | GB19960027075 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9627075 | GB19970022178 | 22.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9722178 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9829513 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0951515 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0951515 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41M5/00, D06P5/00, B41J2/21 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C09D11/40 (EP);
D06P5/30 (EP);
D06P1/382 (EP);
D06P3/663 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/43] | Title | German: | MEHRFARBIGES TITENSTRAHL-DRUCKVERFAHREN | [1999/43] | English: | MULTICOLOUR INK JET PRINTING METHOD | [1999/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPRIMERIE AU JET D'ENCRE MULTICOLORE | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.04.2003 | CH | 16.04.2003 | FR | 16.04.2003 | IT | 16.04.2003 | LI | 16.04.2003 | DE | 17.07.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
FR | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
DE | 17.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
DE | 17.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | CH | 16.04.2003 | |
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
DE | 17.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 16.04.2003 | |
LI | 16.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0621367 (CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1,19,22 * abstract * * page 5, lines 34-39 *; | [A]JPH07173419 ; | [A]US5273573 (WILLIAM D. KAPPELE); | [A]WO9427827 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP.) [A] 28-30 * abstract *; | [A]US4965595 (HISASHI YOSHIMURA) [A] 28-30 * abstract * | [PX] - ANONYMOUS, "Colouration of substrate for use on paper or overhead projector slide - comprises ink jet printing first set of ink(s) containing yellow, magenta, cyan and optionally black colourant and second set of inks of dye", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 05, Database accession no. 98-049997, XP002059648 [PX] 1-32 * abstract * | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH, GB, (19971210), vol. 404, no. 030 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 37, Database accession no. 95-277523, XP002059649 & JPH07173419 A 19950711 (CANON KK) [A] * abstract * |