EP0947034 - VEHICLE BATTERY POST TERMINAL CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEONI WIRING SYSTEMS UK LIMITED 60 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8LT / GB | [2000/37] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited 46 Park Street London W1Y 4DJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Stratford Road Solihull B90 4LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISBY, Reginald, Alan The Granary,St. Anne's Vale Brown Edge Stoke on Trent Staffordshire ST6 8TA / GB | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2000/50] |
Former [2000/38] | White, Duncan Rohan Reginald W Barker & Co Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BY / GB | ||
Former [2000/37] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Reginald W Barker & Co Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BY / GB | ||
Former [1999/40] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97950285.3 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997GB03495 | Priority number, date | GB19960026641 | 21.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9626641 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828820 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947034 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947034 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R11/28, H01R4/26, H01M2/30 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
H01R11/283 (EP,US);
H01R4/5016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSKLEMME FÜR FAHRZEUGBATTERIEPOLE | [1999/46] | English: | VEHICLE BATTERY POST TERMINAL CLAMP | [1999/40] | French: | COSSE POUR BORNE DE BATTERIE DE VEHICULE | [1999/40] |
Former [1999/40] | ANSCHLUSSKLEMME FÜR BATTERIEPOLS IN FAHRZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.05.2000 | SE | 24.08.2000 | [2001/29] |
Former [2001/27] | SE | 24.08.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3678449 (JONES RICHARD CLIVE) [A] 1-6; | [A]DE3010017 (PALSSON JOHANNES SAEMUNDUR)[A] 1-6; | [X]EP0582854 (HAUSEN AUTO KABEL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6; | [A]GB2287587 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 |