EP0954392 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A STEEL STRIP OR SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/45] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A STEEL STRIP OR SHEET | ||
[2004/06] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Opposition rejected | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corus Staal BV P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA Ijmuiden / NL | [2004/19] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Hoogovens Staal B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNELISSEN, Marcus, Cornelis, Maria Willem Alexandersingel 2 NL-1902 BZ Castricum / NL | 02 /
GROOT, Aldricus, Maria Middenweg 496 NL-1704 BM Heerhugowaard / NL | 03 /
DEN HARTOG, Huibert, Willem Troelstralaan 2 NL-2211 AC Noordwijkerhout / NL | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Willem Joseph Maria, et al Tata Steel Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Hansen, Willem Joseph Maria, et al Corus Technology BV Corus Intellectual Property Department PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | ||
Former [1999/45] | Hansen, Willem Joseph Maria Hoogovens Corporate Services BV, Industrial Property Department, P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 97950513.8 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997NL00718 | Priority number, date | NL19961004829 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: NL 1004829 | [1999/45] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826882 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954392 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954392 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/46, B21B1/26, C21D8/02, C21D8/04 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
B21B1/26 (EP,US);
B21B1/46 (KR);
B21B1/466 (EP,US);
C21D8/0231 (EP,US);
B21B2201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Extension states | LT | 19.07.1999 | LV | 19.07.1999 | SI | 19.07.1999 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STAHLBAND ODER STAHLBLECH | [2004/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A STEEL STRIP OR SHEET | [2004/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN RUBAN OU D'UNE TOLE D'ACIER | [2004/06] |
Former [1999/45] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELUNG VON STAHLBAND ODER STAHLBLECH | ||
Former [1999/45] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A STEEL STRIP OR SHEET | ||
Former [1999/45] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UN RUBAN OU D'UNE TOLE D'ACIER | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1999 | Translation filed | 19.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.05.2005
17.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.05.2005
17.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.05.2005
17.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Valentin-Gihske-Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | 08.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.08.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.05.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/28] | Appeal following opposition | 27.10.2006 | Appeal received No. T1643/06 | 04.01.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.05.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Request for further processing for: | 04.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 06.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 04.08.2004 | LI | 04.08.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | IE | 20.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/45] | CH | 04.08.2004 | |
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | CH | 04.08.2004 | |
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 04.08.2004 | |
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0226446 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 11, line 22 - column 12, line 11 *; | [A]EP0306076 (HOOGOVENS GROEP BV [NL]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [YA]DE19520832 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6; | [PX]EP0761326 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 3, line 43 - line 48 * * column 4, line 19 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP0771596 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 5, line 32 - line 48; figure . *; | [DPXA]WO9746332 (HOOGOVENS STAAL BV [NL], et al) [DPX] 1,2,5,6 * page 24, line 5 - line 11; figure -; claims 1,21 * [A] 3,4; | [Y] - G. MCMANUS, "Ferritic rolling of hot rolled sheet: Successful use of new technology could open doors", IRON & STEEL ENGINEER, PITTSBURGH, PA, USA, (199508), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 53 - 54, XP000527905 [Y] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - MESSIEN P ET AL, "LE LAMINAGE A FROID ET LE RECUIT DES BANDES A CHAUD FERRITIQUES*", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, (19920501), vol. 89, no. 5, pages 447 - 453, XP000293321 [A] 1-6 * abstract * |