EP0937312 - ANTENNA ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNK, Thomas, J. 4680 White Rock Circle 4 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
MALDONADO, David 3321 Ash Street San Diego, CA 92102 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97950694.6 | 25.11.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US21599 | Priority number, date | US19960758865 | 02.12.1996 Original published format: US 758865 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825322 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937312 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937312 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H04B1/38, G01R31/28 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H04B1/3877 (EP,US);
H01Q1/24 (KR);
H01Q1/242 (EP,US);
H01Q1/27 (KR);
H04B1/3833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | ANTENNENADAPTER | [1999/34] | English: | ANTENNA ADAPTER | [1999/34] | French: | ADAPTATEUR D'ANTENNE | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 19.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2003 | BE | 02.07.2003 | IT | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | PT | 02.10.2003 | ES | 13.10.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/46] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
ES | 13.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | PT | 02.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0331435 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0412852 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [PXL]WO9724624 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [PXL] 1-17* the whole document * |