EP0888220 - PRINTER RIBBON IDENTIFICATION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FARGO ELECTRONICS, INC. 7901 Flying Cloud Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINEFELTER, Gary, M. 18763 Erin Bay Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 97950752.2 | 02.12.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997US21921 | Priority number, date | US19960759373 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: US 759373 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824637 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888220 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888220 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J17/36 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B41J17/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/01] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNGSSENSOR FÜR EIN FARBBAND | [1999/01] | English: | PRINTER RIBBON IDENTIFICATION SENSOR | [1999/01] | French: | DETECTEUR D'IDENTIFICATION DE RUBAN D'IMPRIMANTE | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 15.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6122972 ; | [A]JPH01237185 ; | [A]GB2219553 (TRIUMPH ADLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 9 - page 17; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4897914 (LOUBIER ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [DA]US5385416 (MAEKAWA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-12* column W *; | [A]US5444370 (WU MIEN T [US]) [A] 1,5,8 * column W *; | [A]EP0670473 (CTS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860619), vol. 010, no. 174, Database accession no. (M - 490), & JP61022972 A 19860131 (FUJI XEROX KK) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891215), vol. 013, no. 567, Database accession no. (M - 908), & JP01237185 A 19890921 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract * |