EP1021105 - FINGER GRIP FOR A FASTENING SYSTEM AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Phillip P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GORMAN, Michael, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
RASMUSSEN, David, P. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97950838.9 | 04.12.1997 | [2000/30] | WO1997US22246 | Priority number, date | US19970893946 | 16.07.1997 Original published format: US 893946 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903369 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021105 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1021105 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A44B18/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
A44B18/0088 (EP,US);
A44B18/00 (KR);
A44B18/0049 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2792 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/30] | Title | German: | FINGERGRIFF FÜR EINBEFESTIGUNSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2002/35] | English: | FINGER GRIP FOR A FASTENING SYSTEM AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [2000/30] | French: | ELEMENT DE PREHENSION POUR SYSTEME DE FERMETURE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/30] |
Former [2000/30] | FINGERGREIFTEIL FÜR EINEN HAFTVERSCHLUSS UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/01] | NL | 26.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9423610 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,6,10,13,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4894060 (NESTEGARD SUSAN K [US]) [DA] 1,6,10,13,16 * column W * | by applicant | US3893460 | US3937221 | US4043340 | US4084592 | US5288546 | US5399219 | US5176670 | US5053028 |