EP0948452 - METHOD FOR FORMING AND TRANSPORTING CARTONS OF PRINTED BOOKLETS AND IMPLEMENTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Réalisations, Etudes & Commercialisation de Matériel pour l'Industrie, RECMI Z.A. Valmer Cherré 72400 La Ferté Bernard / FR | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODEREAU, Jean-Pierre Z.A. Valmer Cherré F-72400 La Ferté Bernard / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz 38/40 Allée du Closeau ZI des Richardets 93166 Noisy Le Grand Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz, 18, Boulevard Péreire 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97951280.3 | 09.12.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997FR02240 | Priority number, date | FR19960015147 | 10.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615147 | [1999/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825846 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948452 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948452 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H33/12, B65H33/02, B65H31/06 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B65H33/02 (EP);
B65H31/06 (EP);
B65H2301/42146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1999/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG VON EINHEITEN AUS GESTAPELTEN BEDRUCKTEN BöGEN, SOWIE EINEVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFüHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS. | [1999/41] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING AND TRANSPORTING CARTONS OF PRINTED BOOKLETS AND IMPLEMENTING DEVICE | [1999/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION ET DE TRANSPORT DE CARTOUCHES DE CAHIERS IMPRIMES AINSI QUE SON DISPOSTIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 02.05.2002 | AT | 09.12.2002 | GB | 09.12.2002 | ES | 10.12.2002 | CH | 31.12.2002 | LI | 31.12.2002 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/31] | IE | 02.05.2002 | |
AT | 09.12.2002 | ||
GB | 09.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | IE | 02.05.2002 | |
GB | 09.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/01] | IE | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | IE | 02.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0384255 (COSTI SILVANO [IT]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0623542 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2724147 (GAEMMERLER HAGEN [DE]) [DA] 1-11* the whole document *; | [DA]FR2733217 (REALISATIONS ETUDES ET COMMERC [FR]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * |