EP0956407 - TONGUE AND GROOVE MULTIPLE STEP PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sahramaa, Kimmo, Juhani 11301 South Shore Road Reston, VA 22090 / US | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Rostovanyi, Peter AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 97951538.4 | 05.12.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US22158 | Priority number, date | US19960771821 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: US 771821 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826139 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956407 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956407 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/18, E04D3/30, E04D3/362 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
E04D1/18 (EP,US);
E04D1/06 (EP,US);
E04D1/26 (EP,US);
E04D3/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | E04D1/18 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | GETREPPTES ELEMENT MIT NUT UND FEDER | [1999/46] | English: | TONGUE AND GROOVE MULTIPLE STEP PANEL | [1999/46] | French: | PANNEAU A RAINURE ET LANGUETTE A GRADINS MULTIPLES | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1609127 (MAX RACHLIN) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,10* figures 4,6,7 *; | [A]WO8503969 (MAEKELAEN PELTITUOTE OY [FI]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [A]US373373 ; | [A]US1149204 (MARTIN CHARLES E [US]); | [X]CA544151 (MCCREADY WILLIAM B); | [Y]US3754366 (JANSSON J, et al); | [A]US4671037 (BIENVENU JOSEPH [CA]); | [A]GB2239031 (SAIVOSALMI RISTO); | [XP]US5613337 (PLATH DAVID J [US], et al) |