blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0929248

EP0929248 - INTERACTIVE MULTIPLE BLADDER SEATING COMFORT ADJUSTEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CTEX Seat Comfort Limited
Beech Avenue, Derby Road Burton on Trent
Staffordshire DE13 0BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]For all designated states
CTEX Seat Comfort Limited
Beech Avenue, Derby Road
Burton on Trent, Staffordshire DE13 OBQ / GB
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
McCORD WINN TEXTRON INC.
645 Harvey Road
Manchester, NH 03103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LONG, Bruce, T.
45 James Drive
Hampstead, NH 03841 / US
02 / FINKELSTEIN, Jeffrey, I.
1 Pine Haven Shore Road
Shelburne, VT 05482 / US
03 / HABA, Antony, R., III
6 Morning Star Drive
Stratham, NH 03885 / US
04 / LIZOTTE, Donna, L.
238 South Road
Kensington, NH 03827 / US
05 / BISSELL, Alfred, E., III
9 Adams Road
Boxford, MA 01921 / US
06 / KACKENMEISTER, Carl, F.
10 Country Farm Road
Stratham, NH 03885 / US
07 / CASTRIGNO, Steven
165 Blackwater Road No. 4
Somersworth, NH 03878 / US
08 / DAM, Tuan, A.
36 Union Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
09 / GATTUSO, David, A.
263 North Road
Deerfield, NH 03037 / US
10 / SARDASHTI, Babak
29 Sharon Road
Windham, NH 03087 / US
[1999/29]
Representative(s)Burrows, Anthony Gregory
Business Centre West
Avenue One, Business Park
Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]Burrows, Anthony Gregory
Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park
Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB
Application number, filing date97951680.412.12.1997
[1999/29]
WO1997US22960
Priority number, dateUS1997080851127.02.1997         Original published format: US 808511
[1999/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9837790
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0929248
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A47C3/00, A47C7/14, A47C27/10, B60N2/02, B60N2/44
[1999/29]
CPC:
B60N2/665 (EP,US); A47C27/082 (EP,US); A47C27/083 (EP,US);
A47C27/10 (EP,US); A47C4/54 (EP,US); A47C7/467 (EP,US);
B60N2/62 (EP,US); B60N2/66 (US); B60N2/914 (EP,US);
B60N2/99 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/29]
TitleGerman:INTERAKTIVE VERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SITZ MIT MEHREREN LUFTZELLEN[1999/29]
English:INTERACTIVE MULTIPLE BLADDER SEATING COMFORT ADJUSTEMENT[1999/29]
French:REGLAGE DE CONFORT INTERACTIF POUR UN SIEGE EQUIPE D'UN SYSTEME A ALVEOLES D'AIR MULTIPLES[1999/29]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1998National basic fee paid 
25.11.1998Search fee paid 
25.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
11.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/21]
05.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.09.2000M01   Fee paid on   06.10.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200610   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US4634083  (MCKINNON GORDON M [CA]);
 [A]US4634179  (HASHIMOTO NOBUYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4655505  (KASHIWAMURA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4707027  (HORVATH ZOLTAN L [US], et al);
 [A]US4722550  (IMAOKA NAOHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US4807931  (ISHIDA KEIICHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4833614  (SAITOH MASATSUGU [JP], et al);
 [A]US4915124  (SEMBER III JOSEPH A [US]);
 [A]US5137329  (NEALE COLIN G [US]);
 [A]US5263765  (NAGASHIMA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5283735  (GROSS CLIFFORD M [US], et al);
 [A]US5373595  (JOHNSON PETER D [CA], et al)
by applicantUS4655505
 US4707027
 US4722550
 US4807931
 US4833614
 US4915124
 US5137329
 US5263765
 US5283735
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.