EP0939735 - LID FOR A RECEPTACLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordes, Annegret Falkenweg 45 49377 Vechta / DE | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORDES, Annegret Falkenweg 45 D-49377 Vechta / DE | 02 /
CORDES, Claus Falkenweg 45 D-49377 Vechta / DE | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951872.7 | 10.11.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997EP06223 | Priority number, date | DE1996219566U | 11.11.1996 Original published format: DE 29619566 U | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821112 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939735 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939735 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/06, B65D51/24 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
B65D51/245 (EP,US);
G08B7/06 (EP,US);
G09F27/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | AUFSATZ FÜR BEHÄLTER | [1999/36] | English: | LID FOR A RECEPTACLE | [1999/36] | French: | COUVERCLE POUR RECIPIENT | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2001 | 30.11.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.09.2002 | IE | 04.09.2002 | IT | 04.09.2002 | DK | 04.12.2002 | SE | 04.12.2002 | PT | 13.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/17] | FI | 04.09.2002 | |
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
DK | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 04.09.2002 | |
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | IE | 04.09.2002 | |
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | IE | 04.09.2002 | |
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | SE | 04.12.2002 | |
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 04.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE16953 (MEISER) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 15 - column R, line 11; figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB621321 (GEORGE MCSTAY JACKSON, et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 68 - line 85; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2547450 (TRUST COMPANY EQUITABLE, et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 10; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US3219237 (MARIE JACKSON CLARE) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE29613250U (ROESNER MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 7, line 5 - page 9, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [XP]DE29714843U (NIERMANN WOLFGANG [DE]) [XP] 1-4* page 3, line 28 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,2 * |