EP0882178 - INTAKE AND EXHAUST DEVICE WITH MULTIPLE SECTIONS OF SPECIFIC GEOMETRY, FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centro Ricerche Tecnologiche S.R.L. Viale Tiberio, 11 47037 Rimini / IT | [1998/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELLAROSA, Stefano Via Soleri Brancaleoni, 7 I-47037 Rimini / IT | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Ripamonti, Enrico, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. s.r.l., 19/B, Via Rosolino Pilo 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97951959.2 | 24.11.1997 | [1998/50] | WO1997EP06554 | Priority number, date | IT1996FO00027 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: IT FO960027 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823854 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882178 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882178 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/00, F02B27/04 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
F02M35/10118 (EP,US);
F02B27/00 (KR);
F02B27/006 (EP,US);
F02B27/04 (EP,US);
F02B61/02 (EP,US);
F02M35/10124 (EP,US);
F02M35/10262 (EP,US);
F02M35/10301 (EP,US);
F02B2275/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/50] | Title | German: | LUFTEINLASS- UND LUFTAUSLASSVORRICHTUNG MIT BEREICHEN VON UNTERSCHIEDLICHER GEOMETRIE FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN | [1998/50] | English: | INTAKE AND EXHAUST DEVICE WITH MULTIPLE SECTIONS OF SPECIFIC GEOMETRY, FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1998/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMISSION ET D'ECHAPPEMENT AYANT DES SECTIONS MULTIPLES DE GEOMETRIE SPECIFIQUE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1998/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 18.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2002 | NL | 16.01.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
NL | 16.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR818457 (BREV & PROCEDES COANDA SA D ET) [X] 1,2,6,9-15,19-21,27,29,30 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 15 - line 73; figures 1-7 *; | [X]GB478575 (BREV ET PROCEDES COANDA SOC CO, et al) [X] 1,2,6,16,19,30 * page 1, line 25 - line 43 * * page 3, line 46 - line 69; figure 8 *; | [X]DE1914859 (RUNGE DIPL KFM FRANZ JOACHIM) [X] 1-5,9,10,12,16,18,20-22,24,28,30 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE3734616 (LEISTRITZ HANS KARL [DE]) [X] 1* abstract * | Examination | US4363302 | US4420438 | US5009681 | US5273014 | US5979401 |