EP0943119 - RETICLE THAT COMPENSATES FOR LENS ERROR IN A PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 5204 East Ben White Boulevard M/S 562 Austin TX 78741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Mail Stop 562, 5204 East Ben White Boulevard Austin, TX 78741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Bradley, T. 1502 Johnny Miller Trail Austin, TX 78746 / US | 02 /
DAWSON, Robert 3504 Beartree Circle Austin, TX 78730 / US | 03 /
FULFORD, H., Jim 9808 Woodshire Drive Austin, TX 78748 / US | 04 /
GARDNER, Mark, I. P.O. Box 249,Highway 535 Cedar Creek, TX 78612 / US | 05 /
HAUSE, Frederick, N. 4702 Circle Oak Cove Austin, TX 78749 / US | 06 /
MICHAEL, Mark, W. 1805 Dayflower Trace Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | 07 /
WRISTERS, Derick, J. 1904 Terish Cove Austin, TX 78728 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes & Martin, High Holborn House, 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97952347.9 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US22616 | Priority number, date | US19960760031 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: US 760031 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825182 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943119 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943119 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G03F7/70433 (EP,US);
G03F1/62 (KR);
G03F1/70 (EP,US);
G03F1/72 (KR);
G03F7/70241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/38] | Title | German: | MASKE ZUR AUSGLEICHUNG EINES LINSENFEHLERS IN EINEM PHOTOLITHOGRAPHISCHEN SYSTEM | [1999/38] | English: | RETICLE THAT COMPENSATES FOR LENS ERROR IN A PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIC SYSTEM | [1999/38] | French: | RETICULE CORRIGEANT LES DEFAUTS DE LENTILLE DANS UN SYSTEME DE PHOTOLITHOGRAVURE | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5308991 (KAPLAN SHAY [US]) [DX] 1,5-8,10-14,21,22,26-30 * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 42; figure - *; | [XY]EP0307726 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-14,21-23,26-30 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 17 * * column 6, line 25 - line 27 * * figure 1 * [Y] 9,15-19; | [Y]DE1522285 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [Y] 9,15-19 * figure -; claims 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]EP0689099 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 3,24 * column 6, line 19 - column 9, line 18 * * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]EP0724199 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,11,26-30 * abstract * |