blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967952

EP0967952 - EXTENSIBLE AND/OR FLEXIBLE DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE FOR SECURE TOPICAL ADHESIVE ATTACHMENT TO THE SKIN OF THE WEARER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.10.2001 [2001/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORZANI, Italo
Via Fonte Vecchia, 40
I-66100 Chieti / IT
02 / DIVO, Michael
Feldbergstrasse 14
D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Kohol, Sonia, et al
Procter & Gamble
European Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Kohol, Sonia, et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date97952545.822.12.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US23475
Priority number, dateEP1996012074023.12.1996         Original published format: EP 96120740
EP1997011073201.07.1997         Original published format: EP 97110732
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9827915
Date:02.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967952
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/15, C09J153/02, A61F13/56
[2000/01]
CPC:
A61F13/474 (EP); A61F13/15 (KR); A61F13/5605 (EP);
A61F13/82 (EP); C09J153/025 (EP); C08L2666/02 (EP)
C-Set:
C09J153/025, C08L2666/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:AUSDEHNBARER ODER FLEXIBELER SAUGFÄHIGER EINWEGARTIKEL MIT KLEBSTOFF ZUR BEFESTIGUNG DES ARTIKELS AN DER HAUT[2000/01]
English:EXTENSIBLE AND/OR FLEXIBLE DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE FOR SECURE TOPICAL ADHESIVE ATTACHMENT TO THE SKIN OF THE WEARER[2000/01]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE EXTENSIBLE ET/OU FLEXIBLE POUVANT ETRE FIXE SOLIDEMENT PAR ADHESIF TOPIQUE SUR LA PEAU D'UN UTILISATEUR[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1999National basic fee paid 
01.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
31.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9503765  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 25, line 15 - line 26; figures 30,31 *;
 [AD]WO9613238  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5559165  (PAUL CHARLES W [US]) [A] 3 * example -; claim -; table - *;
 [A]WO9510576  (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 20 - page 16, line 20; claim - *;
 [A]US4369284  (CHEN JOHN Y) [A] 1-3 * example -; claim -; table - *;
 [A]US4460364  (CHEN FRANKLIN M C [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * example -; claim -; table - *;
 [A]WO9629968  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [AD]GB2284767  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [AD] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9605789  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]EP0638303  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9701996  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantWO9633683
 WO9516424
 WO9613238
 EP0638303
 CH643730
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.