EP1006972 - DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH SIDE CUFFS COMPRISING AN ADHESIVE FOR SECURE TOPICAL ATTACHMENT OF THE SIDE CUFFS TO THE SKIN OF A WEARER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORZANI, Italo Via Fonte Vecchia, 40 I-66100 Chieti / IT | 02 /
DIVO, Michael Feldbergstrasse 14 D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 03 /
HIRSCH, Uwe, Thomas, Michael, Horst Sterngasse 149 D-64347 Griesheim / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 97952547.4 | 22.12.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US23477 | Priority number, date | EP19960120739 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: EP 96120739 | EP19970110731 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97110731 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827917 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006972 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, C09J153/02, A61F13/56 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A61F13/4752 (EP);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/5611 (EP);
A61F13/82 (EP);
C09J153/00 (EP);
C09J153/02 (EP);
C09J153/025 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT SEITENELEMENTEN, DIE EINEN KLEBER ZUR OBERFLÄCHLICHEN BEFESTIGUNG DER SEITENELEMENTE AN DER HAUT DES BENUTZERS BESITZEN | [2000/24] | English: | DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH SIDE CUFFS COMPRISING AN ADHESIVE FOR SECURE TOPICAL ATTACHMENT OF THE SIDE CUFFS TO THE SKIN OF A WEARER | [2000/24] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE A PROTECTIONS LATERALES, COMPRENANT UN ADHESIF POUR FIXER SOLIDEMENT LESDITES PROTECTIONS A LA PEAU DE L'UTILISATEUR | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/16] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0638303 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 10 *; | [AD]WO9613238 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5559165 (PAUL CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-5 * example -; claim -; table - *; | [A]WO9510576 (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 20 - page 16, line 20; claim - *; | [A]US4369284 (CHEN JOHN Y) [A] 1-5 * example -; claim -; table - *; | [A]US4460364 (CHEN FRANKLIN M C [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * example -; claim -; table - *; | [A]EP0611575 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US5360855 (GOBRAN RAMSIS [US]) [A] 1 * example -; claim -; table - *; | [A]US5057571 (MALCOLM DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim -; table - * | by applicant | WO9633683 | WO9516424 | WO9613238 | EP0638303 | CH643730 |