EP0946895 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE THREE-DIMENSIONAL REPRESENTATION OF INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SeeReal Technologies GmbH Blasewitzer Strasse 41 01307 Dresden / DE | [2003/03] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Dresden 3D GmbH Blasewitzer Strasse 41 01307 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Mommsenstrasse 13 01069 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWERDTNER, Armin Rathener Strasse 7 D-01259 Dresden / DE | 02 /
HEIDRICH, Holger Sobrigauer Weg 10 D-01728 Gaustritz / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Uhlemann, Henry, et al Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Bamberger Strasse 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Uhlemann, Henry, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwalt, Kailuweit & Uhlemann, Bamberger Strasse 49 01187 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | Uhlemann, Henry, Dipl. Chem. Patentanwalt Würzburger Strasse 51 01181 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 97952725.6 | 15.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997DE02910 | Priority number, date | DE1996152689 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19652689 | DE1997136035 | 20.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736035 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827451 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946895 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946895 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, H04N13/00 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G09G3/003 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (EP,US);
G02B30/30 (EP);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN DARSTELLUNG VON INFORMATION | [1999/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE THREE-DIMENSIONAL REPRESENTATION OF INFORMATION | [1999/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA REPRESENTATION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'INFORMATIONS | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2002 | CH | 31.12.2002 | LI | 31.12.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2013/51] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 15.12.2002 | |
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | CH | 31.12.2002 | |
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 31.12.2002 | |
LI | 31.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0354851 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 27 - column 9, line 40; figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0721131 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 19 - column 16, line 11; figures 1-22 *; | [DA]DE29612054U (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [DA] 1,2,5,9,10 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 2-6 *; | [DA] - EZRA D ET AL, "BLICK IN DIE DRITTE DIMENSION NEUES AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHES 3D-DISPLAY-SYSTEM", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, (19960301), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 79 - 82, XP000581416 [DA] 1,10 | [DA] - "AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC 3-D IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 8, pages 463 - 465, XP000456491 [DA] 1,10 | [DA] - R. BÖRNER, "AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC 3D-IMAGING BY FRONT AND REAR PROJECTION AND ON FLAT PANEL DISPLAYS", DISPLAYS, (1993), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 39 - 46, XP002064233 [DA] 1,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-9382(93)90007-R |