EP0941596 - METHOD FOR MEASURING QUALITATIVE PARAMETERS OF A PERMANENTLY CONNECTED MESSAGE TRANSMISSION LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S. W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINFERA, Wolfram Rueppstrasse 57 D-81476 München / DE | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Schurack, Eduard F., et al ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Schurack, Eduard F., et al Strasse & Hofstetter Patentanwälte Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97952819.7 | 28.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997EP06636 | Priority number, date | DE1996150836 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19650836 | [1999/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9824221 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0941596 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/30, H04M3/28, H04B3/46 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
H04B3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN QUALITÄTSBESTIMMENDER PARAMETER EINER FESTVERBUNDENEN NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSSTRECKE | [1999/37] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING QUALITATIVE PARAMETERS OF A PERMANENTLY CONNECTED MESSAGE TRANSMISSION LINK | [1999/37] | French: | PROCEDE POUR MESURER DES PARAMETRES QUALITATIFS D'UN CHAINON DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGES A CONNEXION PERMANENTE | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 02.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 05.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5195124 (ISHIOKA YUZURU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 11 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0647071 (PLLB ELETTRONICA S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 1 - line 11 * * column 5, line 28 - line 50 *; | [A] - BRETSCHNEIDER ET AL, "Keeping tabs on leased data lines", SIEMENS INTERNATIONAL TELCOM REPORT, (199108), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 42 - 43, XP002067929 [A] 1 * abstract * |