Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001507819 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9706774 | 04.12.1997 | DE19700162 | 07.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1018041 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2003 | B1 | EP1018041 | 12.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9706774 | 04.12.1997 | DE19700162 | 07.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59710318D1 | 24.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9706774 | 04.12.1997 | DE19700162 | 07.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6392766 | 21.05.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9706774 | 04.12.1997 | DE19700162 | 07.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9830924 | Global Dossier | 16.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19700162 | 07.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19700162 | 07.09.2006 | B4 | DE19700162 | 16.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19700162 | 07.01.1997 |