EP0950228 - APPARATUS FOR ELECTRONICALLY IMAGING A TOOTH THROUGH TRANSILLUMINATION BY LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/42] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRONICALLY IMAGING A TOOTH THROUGH TRANSILLUMINAION BY LIGHT | ||
[2003/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electro-Optical Sciences, Inc. One Bridge Street, Irvington New York, NY 10553 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states Electro-Optical Sciences, Inc. One Bridge Street, Irvington New York, NY 10553 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELBAUM, Marek 79 Beechdale Road Dobbs Ferry, NY 10522 / US | 02 /
GREENEBAUM, Michael 1177 East 19th Street Brooklyn, NY 11230 / US | 03 /
JACOBS, Adam 212 Baldwin Street Glen Ridge, NJ 07028 / US | 04 /
KEEM, Sunguk 389 Washington Avenue Cliffside Park, NJ 07010 / US | 05 /
SCHNEIDERMAN, Allen, H. 144 Lincoln Avenue Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | 06 /
SHULTZ, Theodore, S. 25 Alden Road Larchmont, NY 15038 / US | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1999/42] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 97953471.6 | 31.12.1997 | [1999/42] | WO1997US23953 | Priority number, date | US19960778001 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: US 778001 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9829050 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950228 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950228 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
A61B1/24 (EP,US);
A61B1/0655 (EP);
A61B5/0013 (EP,US);
A61B5/0088 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0238 (EP,US);
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/42] | G06K9/00, A61C1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/42] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM ELEKTRONISCHEN DARSTELLEN EINES ZAHNES DURCH TRANSILLUMINATION DURCH LICHT | [2003/50] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ELECTRONICALLY IMAGING A TOOTH THROUGH TRANSILLUMINATION BY LIGHT | [2003/51] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE VISUALISER ELECTRONIQUEMENT UNE DENT PAR TRANSILLUMINATION | [2003/50] |
Former [1999/42] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM ELEKTRONISCHEN DARSTELLEN EINES ZAHNES DURCH TRANSILLUMINATIOM DURCH LICHT | ||
Former [1999/42] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRONICALLY IMAGING A TOOTH THROUGH TRANSILLUMINAION BY LIGHT | ||
Former [1999/42] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE VISUALISER ELECTRONIQUEMENT UNE DENT PAR TRANSILLUMINATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.05.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4589846 (ANNONI JERRY D [US]) [A] 1,8,11,12,23* column 3, line 5 - line 38 *; | [XA]DE4307411 (MIRA GMBH [DE]) [X] 11 * column 5, line 3 - line 17 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 28 * * column 6, line 46 - line 62 * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 1 * * column 8, line 16 - line 23 * [A] 21,23,15,16,12,1-3,6,8 | International search | [Y]US4184175 (MULLANE WILLIAM I JR [US]); | [A]US4479499 (ALFANO ROBERT R [US]); | [Y]US5115307 (COOPER DAVID H [US], et al); | [Y]US5429502 (COOPER DAVID H [US], et al) | by applicant | US4446197 |