EP0946489 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING FATTY ACID POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATHS, Hans-Christian Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 13 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
BEHLER, Ansgar Siegfriedstrasse 80 D-46240 Bottrop / DE | 03 /
MILSTEIN, Norman 9715 Zig Zag Road Montgomery, OH 45242 / US | [1999/40] | Application number, filing date | 97953727.1 | 01.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP06705 | Priority number, date | US19960767123 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: US 767123 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825878 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946489 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946489 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/26, C07C69/28, C07C69/52 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C08G65/2672 (EP,US);
C07C67/26 (EP,US);
C08G65/2615 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/26, C07C69/28 (US,EP);
C07C67/26, C07C69/52 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FETTSÄUREPOLYETHYLENGLYCOLESTERN | [1999/40] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING FATTY ACID POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL ESTERS | [1999/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ESTERS DE POLYETHYLENEGLYCOL D'ACIDE GRAS | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 02.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0178913 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 1 - line 29 * * page 14, line 7 - line 23 * * page 16 - page 18; examples 1,2 ** page 19 - page 20; claim - * |