EP0946101 - HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING OXASULFURON AND METHOD OF WEED CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/40] | HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF WEED CONTROL | ||
[2003/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2001/13] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Michael, Donald 1208 Pleasant Ridge Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | 02 /
DUNNE, Cheryl, Lynn 555 10th Court Vero Beach, FL 32962 / US | 03 /
KIDDER, Daniel, Warden 8901 Larchwood Drive Kernersville, NC 27284 / US | 04 /
HUDETZ, Manfred Riburgpark 6 CH-4313 Möhlin / CH | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/43] |
Former [1999/40] | Becker, Konrad, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 97953744.6 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP06800 | Priority number, date | US19960759699 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: US 759699 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824321 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946101 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946101 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, A01N43/90, A01N43/40, A01N43/60, A01N43/50, A01N43/76, A01N35/10 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A01N47/36 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/50, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/50, A01N43/76, A01N43/60, A01N43/40, A01N43/18, A01N43/16, A01N35/10 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/90, A01N43/76, A01N43/60, A01N43/40, A01N43/18, A01N43/16, A01N35/10 (US,EP);
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N47/36, A01N43/76, A01N43/60, A01N43/40, A01N43/18, A01N43/16, A01N35/10 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | IT [1999/40] | Title | German: | HERBIZIDE MITTEL ENTHALTEND OXASULFURON UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG | [2003/05] | English: | HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING OXASULFURON AND METHOD OF WEED CONTROL | [2003/05] | French: | COMPOSITION HERBICIDE CONTENANT DE L'OXASULFURON ET PROCEDE DE DESHERBAGE | [2003/10] |
Former [1999/40] | HERBIZIDE MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG | ||
Former [1999/40] | HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF WEED CONTROL | ||
Former [1999/40] | COMPOSITION HERBICIDE ET PROCEDE DE DESHERBAGE | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5428000 (INNAMI HARUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * claim - * * column 7, line 10 - line 34 * * column 8, line 30 - line 44 *; | [X]US5102442 (HAZEN JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 11 * * column 4, line 44 - line 54 * * column 6, line 20 - line 57 *; | [AD]EP0512739 (DOWELANCO [US]) [AD] 1-11 * claim - * * page 4, line 48 - line 62 *; | [A]EP0298901 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * claim - * * page 3, line 40 - line 41 *; | [A] - DAVID L. JORDAN, "Influence of adjuvants on the antagonism of graminicides by broadleaf herbicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1996), vol. 124, no. 13, Database accession no. 168200, XP002062535 [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - WEED TECHNOL., (1995), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 741 - 747 |