EP0946704 - ENZYMATIC BLEACH COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1999/40] | For:GB
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER HELM, Marcel J., Unilever Research Vlaardingen Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
VAN DER HEIDEN, Monique, Unilever Research Vlaardingen Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
HONDMANN, Dirk Herman Unilever N.V., Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | 04 /
SMITS, Annelies, Unilever Research Vlaardingen Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 05 /
SWARTHOFF, Ton, Unilever Research Vlaardingen Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 06 /
VERRIPS, Cornelis Theodorus, Unilever Research Vlaardingen Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 97953862.6 | 10.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP07138 | Priority number, date | EP19960203734 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: EP 96203734 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9828400 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0946704 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946704 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C11D3/38654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/40] | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE BLEICHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1999/40] | English: | ENZYMATIC BLEACH COMPOSITION | [1999/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BLANCHIMENT ENZYMATIQUE | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB282588 (HERMANN VONTOBEL) [X] 1-3,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1944904 (WOLF UWE DR) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0086139 (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [DX] 1 * claim 32 *; | [X]EP0189687 (SAVONNERIE UNION GENERALE [FR]) [X] 1,4,7-9 * page 9, line 31 - page 12, line 14; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2666348 (NLN SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,7-9 * page 5, line 32 - page 14, line 28 *; | [DA]WO9501426 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1,9* claims 1,14,15,37 * |