18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
09.01.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] |
17.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
06.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
19.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
19.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
02.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.02.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
20.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
20.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
19.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|