EP1015966 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND DATA STRUCTURES FOR COMPUTER SOFTWARE APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT AND EXECUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maves International Software, Inc. Suite 400, 90 Allstate Parkway Markham, Ontario L3R 6H3 / CA | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAVES, Walter 263 St. Germain Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5M 1W4 / CA | 02 /
McGUIRK, Fred Unit 156 9 Esterbrooke Avenue North York, Ontario M2J 2C5 / CA | 03 /
BENNETT, James 50 Burn Hill Road 2505 Scarborough, Ontario M1L 4R3 / CA | 04 /
CLARKE, Matthew 1005 - 7376 Halifax Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 1M5 / CA | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97953998.8 | 12.12.1997 | [2000/27] | WO1997IB01659 | Priority number, date | US19960032833P | 13.12.1996 Original published format: US 32833 P | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9826349 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1015966 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F17/30 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
G06F8/31 (EP,US);
G06F8/10 (EP,US);
G06F8/20 (EP,US);
G06F9/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND DATENSTRUKTUREN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG UND AUSFÜHRUNG VON RECHNERSOFTWAREANWENDUNGEN | [2000/27] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND DATA STRUCTURES FOR COMPUTER SOFTWARE APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT AND EXECUTION | [2000/27] | French: | METHODE, SYSTEME ET STRUCTURES DE DONNEES POUR DEVELOPPER ET EXECUTER DES APPLICATIONS LOGICIELLES INFORMATIQUES | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2010 | 17.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/07] | 09.10.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0228053 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,2,9,11-13,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 36; figure 10- * * page 9, line 46 - page 10, line 24; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0453152 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,2,9,11,13,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 47 - page 5, line 51 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US5386559 (EISENBERG NEAL R [US], et al) [X] 20-24 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9631828 (TALATI KIRIT K [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 10, line 12; figure -; claim - * [A] 17; | [A] - KALUS C ET AL, "Record subtyping in flexible relations by means of attribute dependencies", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING (CAT. NO.95CH35724), TAIPEI, TAIWAN, ISBN 0-8186-6910-1, 1995, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, (19950306), pages 383 - 390, XP002078317 [A] 20,23 * abstract * * page 383, column L, line 19 - page 387, column L, line 19 * |