blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975957

EP0975957 - OXYGEN SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/48]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
P.O. Box 33114
Detroit, MI 48232 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUISELL, Richard, Courtney
1384 Sawdust Corners Road
Lapeer, MI 48446 / US
02 / ACHEY, David, Earl
6440 South Belsay Road
Grand Blanc, MI 48439 / US
03 / DUCE, Richard, William
1111 McKinley Road
Flushing, MI 48433 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John, et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Denton, Michael John, et al
Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date97954142.215.12.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US23238
Priority number, dateUS1997081978518.03.1997         Original published format: US 819785
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9841852
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975957
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975957
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01N27/407
[2000/05]
CPC:
G01N27/4077 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:SAUERSTOFFSENSOR[2000/05]
English:OXYGEN SENSOR[2000/05]
French:DETECTEUR D'OXYGENE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
17.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2002Fee for grant paid
07.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0702229  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * abstract * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 39; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0704698  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 39; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4556475  (BAYHA KURT [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.