EP1040666 - LOW NOISE ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Haoping, Apartment 3012 3029 West 39th Street Indianapolis, IN 46228 / US | 02 /
McNEELY, David, Lowell 7832 Warbler Court Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | 03 /
BEYERS, Billy, Wesley, Jr. 6920 Woodcrest Drive Greenfield, IN 46140 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Kerber, Thierry TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Kerber, Thierry Thomson multimedia, 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97954261.0 | 23.12.1997 | [2000/40] | WO1997US23992 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933273 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040666 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040666 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/14 (EP);
H04N19/85 (KR);
H04N19/117 (KR);
H04N19/124 (EP);
H04N19/137 (EP);
H04N19/14 (EP);
H04N19/16 (EP);
H04N19/172 (EP);
H04N19/174 (EP);
H04N19/179 (EP);
H04N19/182 (EP);
H04N19/527 (EP);
H04N19/59 (EP);
H04N19/60 (EP);
H04N19/80 (EP);
H04N19/146 (EP);
H04N19/149 (EP);
H04N19/15 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG MIT NIEDRIGEM RAUSCHPEGEL | [2000/40] | English: | LOW NOISE ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD | [2000/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE AVEC FAIBLE BRUIT | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02009860.4 / EP1239679 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5049993 (LEGALL DIDIER J [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 8; figures 1,6 * [A] 1,13; | [A]EP0498625 (GRASS VALLEY GROUP [US]) [A] 1,13* column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 56 *; | [XA]US5253059 (ANSARI RASHID [US], et al) [X] 16-18 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 33; figure 1 * [A] 1,13; | [A]EP0595323 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * column 6, line 37 - column 12, line 22 *; | [A]WO9515659 (COMPRESSION LABS INC [US]) [A] 1,13 * page 25, line 29 - page 29, line 14 *; | [A]EP0685968 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1,13 * column 17, line 49 - column 19, line 8 *; | [A]EP0708564 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,13 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 27; figure 2 * * page 8, line 44 - page 9, line 30; figure 5 *; | [A]US5530484 (BHATT BHAVESH B [US], et al) [A] 19 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]WO9627981 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,13 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 3; figure 1 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 12 *; | [A]WO9739577 (SNELL & WILCOX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,13 * page 7, line 14 - line 27 * |