EP1010130 - LOW FALSE ALARM RATE VIDEO SECURITY SYSTEM USING OBJECT CLASSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esco Electronics Corporation 8888 Ladue Road, Suite 200 St. Louis Missouri 63124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Esco Electronics Corporation 8888 Ladue Road, Suite 200 St. Louis, Missouri 63124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOTTON, John, R. 700 Rugby Court St. Louis, MO 63141 / US | 02 /
WALDMAN, Gary, S. 12934 Walnut Way St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | 03 /
HOBSON, Gregory, L. 17 Upper Dardenne Farms Drive St. Charles, MO 63304 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 97954298.2 | 23.12.1997 | [2000/25] | WO1997US24163 | Priority number, date | US19960772595 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: US 772595 | US19960771991 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: US 771991 | US19960772731 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: US 772731 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828706 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010130 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06K9/46, G06T7/20, G08B13/194, G08B23/00, H04N7/18 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G08B13/19602 (EP);
G08B13/19604 (EP);
G08B13/19606 (EP);
G08B13/1961 (EP);
H04N7/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | G06K9/20, G06K9/46, G08B23/00, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGFALSCHALARMRATEN-VIDEOSICHERHEITSSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON OBJEKTKLASSIFIZIERUNG | [2000/25] | English: | LOW FALSE ALARM RATE VIDEO SECURITY SYSTEM USING OBJECT CLASSIFICATION | [2000/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE VIDEO A FAIBLE TAUX DE FAUSSES ALERTES UTILISANT LA CLASSIFICATION D'OBJETS | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02171897 ; | [A]JPH07192112 | [Y] - YOUNG HO KIM ET AL, "An implementation of real-time hardware for moving object detection and discrimination", TENCON '96. PROCEEDINGS., 1996 IEEE TENCON. DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS PERTH, WA, AUSTRALIA 26-29 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961126), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3679-8, pages 961 - 966, XP010236812 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1996.608478 | [Y] - MECOCCI A ET AL, "IMAGE SEQUENCE ANALYSIS FOR COUNTING IN REAL TIME PEOPLE GETTING INAND OUT OF A BUS", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199401), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 0165-1684, pages 105 - 116, XP000435716 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-1684(94)90039-6 | [Y] - LAND E H, "THE RETINEX THEORY OF COLOR VISION", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN INC. NEW YORK, US, (197712), vol. 237, no. 6, ISSN 0036-8733, pages 108 - 120,122, XP008041094 [Y] 1-23 * page 118, column R - page 120, column R * | [A] - GONZALEZ R C ET AL, "IMAGE SEGMENTATION AND DESCRIPTION", DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, (1977), pages 320 - 322,345,34, XP002981665 [A] 3,6,15,17 * the whole document * | [A] - GOUJOU E ET AL, "Human detection with video surveillance system", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL, AND INSTRUMENTATION, 1995., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1995 IEEE IECON 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-10 NOV. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19951106), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3026-9, pages 1179 - 1184, XP010154890 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1995.483964 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900919), vol. 014, no. 438, Database accession no. (P - 1108), & JP02171897 A 19900703 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07192112 A 19950728 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5144685 ; | [Y]US5465308 ; | [Y]US5493273 | [X] - KANETA M, ET AL., "IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD FOR INTRUDER DETECTION AROUND POWER LINE TOWERS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTEMS., INFORMATION & SYSTEMS SOCIETY, TOKYO., JP, JP, (19931001), vol. E76-D, no. 10, ISSN 0916-8532, pages 1153 - 1161, XP002925939 | [Y] - GONZALEZ R C, ET AL., "IMAGE SEGMENTATION AND DESCRIPTION", DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, XX, XX, XX, (19770101), pages 320 - 322,345,348, XP002981665 |