EP0944654 - ANIONIC POLYMERISATION OF ACRYLATES AND METHACRYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÜNGLING, Stephan Augartenstrasse 79 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
GAUSEPOHL, Hermann Medardusring 74 D-67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 03 /
WARZELHAN, Volker Südtiroler Ring 32 D-67273 Weisenheim / DE | 04 /
MCKEE, Graham, Edmund Heinrich-Strieffler-Strasse 68 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 05 /
FISCHER, Michael 29 Pater-Baroffio-Weg D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1999/39] | Application number, filing date | 97954344.4 | 01.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997EP06711 | Priority number, date | DE1996151299 | 10.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651299 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9825975 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0944654 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944654 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/12, C08L53/00, C08F287/00 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C08F297/026 (EP,US);
C08F20/00 (KR);
C08F2/06 (EP,US);
C08F20/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/39] | Title | German: | ANIONISCHE POLYMERISATION VON ACRYLATEN UND METHACRYLATEN | [1999/39] | English: | ANIONIC POLYMERISATION OF ACRYLATES AND METHACRYLATES | [1999/39] | French: | POLYMERISATION ANIONIQUE D'ACRYLATES ET DE METHACRYLATES | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2131111 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [DA]EP0524054 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) |