blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976130

EP0976130 - MASTER FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL DISCS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovators AG
Industrieplatz
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Drecoll, Harm
Fronhof 22
8260 Stein am Rhein / CH
 [2003/05]
Former [2000/05]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Haber, Jan Wilhelm
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Schrooten Haber
Mörsenbroicher Weg 200
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]Haber, Jan Wilhelm
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Schrooten Haber Mörsenbroicher Weg 200
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/05]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date97954392.312.12.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997EP06985
Priority number, dateDE199615307819.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19653078
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9827551
Date:25.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976130
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976130
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationIPC:G11B7/26
[2000/05]
CPC:
G11B7/263 (EP,US); B29C33/424 (EP,US); B29D17/005 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/17]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:MASTER FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG OPTISCHER PLATTEN[2000/05]
English:MASTER FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL DISCS[2000/05]
French:MODELE-MAITRE POUR LA FABRICATION DE PLAQUES OPTIQUES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase14.07.1999National basic fee paid 
14.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
20.07.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.03.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT
08.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2002Fee for grant paid
24.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.12.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200004   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2001
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.11.2002
GB27.11.2002
IT27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
DE01.07.2003
[2008/08]
Former [2006/14]FR27.11.2002
GB27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
DE01.07.2003
Former [2004/22]GB27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
DE01.07.2003
Former [2004/05]NL27.11.2002
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
DE01.07.2003
Former [2004/04]NL27.11.2002
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/30]NL27.11.2002
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE27.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0418897  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 16 * column 2, line 4 - line 14; figure 1 * * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 2 * [A] 1-15;
 [XA]US4729940  (NEE HANPHIRE H [US], et al) [X] 16 * abstract * [A] 1-15;
 [XA]JPS6437738  ;
 [XA]US5494782  (MAENZA GLENN J [US], et al) [X] 16 * abstract * [A] 1-15
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890526), vol. 013, no. 228, Database accession no. (P - 877), & JP01037738 A 19890208 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 16 * abstract * [A] 1-15
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.