EP0951490 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYMERS FROM VINYLAROMATIC COMPOUNDS BY DISPERSION POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜNSCH, Josef Gartenstrasse 31c D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael Landauer Strasse 64b D-67434 Neustadt / DE | [1999/43] | Application number, filing date | 97954449.1 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/43] | WO1997EP07213 | Priority number, date | DE1997100305 | 09.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19700305 | [1999/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830613 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0951490 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0951490 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F12/04 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C08F12/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F2420/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65912 (US,EP);
C08F12/08, C08F4/46 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1999/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMERISATEN AUS VINYLAROMATISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN DURCH DISPERSIONSPOLYMERISATION | [1999/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYMERS FROM VINYLAROMATIC COMPOUNDS BY DISPERSION POLYMERIZATION | [1999/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYMERISATS A BASE DE COMPOSES VINYLAROMATIQUES PAR POLYMERISATION EN DISPERSION | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2137676 (MOBIL OIL CORP) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0361309 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,9 *; | [DA]DE4330969 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * claim 8 * |